judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL L. ALEXANDER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1422
Short Caption:MICHAEL L. ALEXANDER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10591-87Filed Date:11/03/1988

Opening Event Date:11/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/08/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael L. Alexander N
Thomas T. Ruffin, Jr.YY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James N. Plamondon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALEXANDER, MICHAEL L. UNITED STATES
11/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
06/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (116 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 010289 SCHPRD R
08/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(54 PGS/ WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 040589 SCHPRD RT
09/14/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELFF SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD CHECK
10/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 9, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102490 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1990ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 10 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD B
12/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 113090 SCHPRD BA
12/06/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/08/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 020791 SCHPRD BE
01/08/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF & BRF IS FL. FO THAT APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD B
04/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1991SUBMITTED PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD