judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LORENZO T. SIMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1423
Short Caption:LORENZO T. SIMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12618-87Filed Date:11/03/1988

Opening Event Date:11/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/20/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLorenzo T. Simpson N
Rufus W. Mckinney, Jr.NY
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Herbie Difonzo YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIMPSON, LORENZO T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 090689 ORD: GRANT MO TO NOTE - 01 VACATE APPOINTMENT OF RUFUS NOTE - 02 W. MCKINNEY, JR.; FO J. HERBIE NOTE - 02 DIFONZO IS APPOINTED TO REPRE- NOTE - 03 SENT APLT; BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS; NOTE - 03 FO BRF SHALL ADDRESS, INTER NOTE - 04 ALIA, TERRY STOP/SUPPRESSION NOTE - 04 ISSUE. NOTE - 05 073090 ORD: APPEAL STAYED NOTE - 05 PENDING RESOULTION OF MOT FOR NOTE - 06 COLLATERAL RELIEF FILED IN NOTE - 06 TRIAL CT; F/O COUNSEL TO AD- NOTE - 07 VISE COURT W/I 5 DAYS OF NOTE - 07 RESOLUTION IN TRIAL COURT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/03/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DIFONZOJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ACKERE FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 MCKINNEYR VACATED 9/6/89
11/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RUFUS W. McKINNEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS FOR TEN (10) DAYS SUBSEQUENT TO RECEIPT OF COMPLETED TRIAL TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
01/31/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (10 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 010289 SCHPRD R
02/03/1989ORDER DENY MO FOR EXTENSION TO FILE DSA & DSA IS DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD M
02/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD DSA
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY(30)DAYS FROM COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(206 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD M
05/25/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FL BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989RECEIVED ANDERS BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 061689 SCHPRD CHECK
06/20/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 7/20/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD X
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. HERBIE DiFONZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. MEH PANELMKBEST SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD VS
10/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 16, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/16/89. GW PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD V
11/20/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD BA
12/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD CHECK
12/20/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011990 SCHPRD BE
12/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRIEF; APLE BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121389 SCHPRD OPE
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/19/1990ARGUED PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1990MISCELLANEOUS APPEAL HELD IN ABEYANCE FOR 30 DAYS FOR TRIAL COURT ACTIVITY (PUBLISHED @ 576 A.2d 1336) PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990NOTICE OF APLT RE FILING IN SUPERIOR COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 072290 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1991NOTICE FROM APLT'S COUNSEL RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL CRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/10/1991ORDER PER 4/3/91 NOTIFICATION FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT RE NEW TRIAL, APPEAL DISMISSED. MEH PANELBESTSC SCDATE 102490 SCHPRD CHECK
04/10/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
05/03/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD