judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD W. POLLARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1395
Short Caption:RICHARD W. POLLARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8340-87Filed Date:10/31/1988

Opening Event Date:10/31/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard W. Pollard N
Stephen F. BrennwaldYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James F. Rutherford YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POLLARD, RICHARD W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: AARON D. PALMER NOTE - 01
10/31/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN F. BRENNWALD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
06/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (128 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD R
01/24/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 22, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 022390 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO FILE BRIEF; CLK TO FILE BRIEF; CLK TO SCHD CASE ON CAL ASAP. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD V
11/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/28/1990SUBMITTED PANELFETEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFETEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD