judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CECIL H. EVANS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1350
Short Caption:CECIL H. EVANS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F208-88Filed Date:10/13/1988

Opening Event Date:10/13/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCecil H. Evans N
W. Bronson Howell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EVANS, CECIL H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON: 88-1351 NOTE - 01
10/13/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. BRONSON HOWELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
12/02/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, CON THIS APPEAL W/88-1351 & APLT BRF SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (202 PGS. -- KACZOROWSKI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 5/11/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD X
08/18/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT ON APPEAL, & GRANT APLT COUNSELS MOTION TO WITH- DRAW. PB PANELFETEST SCDATE 080389 SCHPRD VS
08/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
09/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD