judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL E. SWEET V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1336
Short Caption:PAUL E. SWEET V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Lead: 88-CF-1333 Consolidated:88-CF-1336
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5699-88Filed Date:10/21/1988

Opening Event Date:10/21/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/03/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul E. Sweet N
Stephen L. BragaYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SWEET, PAUL E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON: 88-1333 NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/01/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRAGAS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOCHULW FOR - APPELLEE
10/21/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN L. BRAGA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
12/02/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, CON THIS APPEAL W/88-1333 & SCHD APLT BRF 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 7/20 THRU 7/22/88 RT FROM CT RPTR SCHOCH EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM RPTR GRAYBILL OF 7/25 THRU 7/27/88 PROCEEDINGS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (13 PGS/RUST) AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD R
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(232 PGS RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 5TH JB PANEL SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/5/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD OPA
09/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD BE
09/06/1989RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/26/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD CHECK
01/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM (EXCEPT AS TO THE MANDATED RESENTENCING) PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD