judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LESLIE B. HINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0995
Short Caption:LESLIE B. HINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7668-85Filed Date:08/19/1987

Opening Event Date:08/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeslie B. Hines N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Gilberto De Jesus YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HINES, LESLIE B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/28/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF JAMES KLEIN & APPT LONNIE NOTE - 02 MARK GREENBLATT FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 03 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT NOTE - 03 IS FL. NOTE - 04 7/22/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 05 OF LONNIE M. GREENBLATT & APPT NOTE - 05 STEPHEN SCAVUZZO FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 06 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 07 & CASE STAYED PENDG RESOLUTION NOTE - 08 OF TRL MO; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO NOTE - 08 FL STATE IN 30 DAYS AS TO NOTE - 09 STATUS OF PENDG MO. NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 1/10/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 10 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 11 OF STEPHEN SCAVUZZO & APPT NOTE - 11 WALTER S. BOOTH FOR APLT; NOTE - 12 NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL TO INFORM NOTE - 12 CRT IN 20 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF NOTE - 13 23-110 MO IN TRIAL CRT. NOTE - 13 NOTE - 14 1/30/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 14 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 15 OF WALTER BOOTH & APPT EUGENE NOTE - 15 BOND FOR APLT; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 16 COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 16 AS TO STAUTS OF 23-110 MO IN NOTE - 17 TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 4/14/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 18 EXT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE NOTE - 19 TO THIS CT'S 1/30/89 ORDER TO NOTE - 19 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS NOTE - 20 ORDER. ANY FURTHER REQUEST FOR NOTE - 20 AN EXT. WILL BE LOOKED UPON NOTE - 21 W/DISFAVOR & GRTD ONLY IN NOTE - 21 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTE - 22 4/27/90 ORD: GRT MO TO WITH- NOTE - 22 DRAW AS APLT'S COUNSEL AND THE NOTE - 23 APPTMT OF EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ, NOTE - 23 IS HEREBY VACATED. FO THAT NOTE - 24 MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ, IS NOTE - 24 HEREBY APPTD AS CNSL TO NOTE - 25 REPRESENT APLT ON THIS APPEAL NOTE - 25 AND THAT NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL NOTE - 26 SHALL FILE A SUPPL BRF OR STMT NOTE - 26 INDICATING SHE WILL NOT FILE A NOTE - 27 SUPPL BRF W/I 40 DAYS FM DATE NOTE - 27 OF THIS ORDER. FO THAT THE NOTE - 28 MOTIONS OF APLE TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 28 FILE BRF ARE GRTD AND THE CLK NOTE - 29 IS DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED NOTE - 29 BRF OF APLE AND SHALL SCHEDULE NOTE - 30 THIS CASE FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 30 BEFORE A MERITS DIV. AS SOON NOTE - 31 AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 31
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/27 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DEJESUSG FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 6/28/88. GREENBLATTL VACATED 7/22/88. SCAVUZZOS VACATED 1/10/89. BOOTHW VACATED 1/30/89. BONDE VACATED PER 4/27/90 ORDER
08/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD DSA
09/10/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
03/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (369 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101087 SCHPRD RT
04/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/20/88 (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BA
05/19/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FL BY 6/9/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD V
06/09/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS & TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/30/88-APPELLANT (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 060988 SCHPRD BA
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LONNIE MARK GREENBLATT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD GG
07/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
07/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/22/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN D. SCAVUZZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD GG
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 26, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED IN 10 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD V
10/07/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 10/5/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER ACTION BY TRIAL COURT ON PENDING 23-110 MOTION. AD PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988LETTER TO CNSL FOR APLT RE LTR OF APLT RECVD 10/7/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (STEPHEN SCAVUZZO ESQ) TO LETTER DATED 11/4/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD ANSA
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD ANS
12/19/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF STEPHEN SCAVUZZO AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 12/19/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-AP- POINTED COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989LETTER TO APLT RE COURT-APPTD COUNSEL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-13. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD CHECK
01/11/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 1/9/89 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE S. SCAVUZ- ZO, PREVIOUS COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: PREVIOUS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF WALTER S. BOOTH AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD Q
02/07/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 1/9/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO ORDER 1-30-89 TO 3-19-89 (NO OPPO) ADD PANEL SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD STATE
03/03/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION TO FILE A RESPONSE TO 3/19/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD N
03/16/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO MAY 19, 1989 RE: 23-110 MOTION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031989 SCHPRD ANSA
04/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18 THRU 21 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD N
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD ANSA
06/27/1989ORDER APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL FILE A STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO PDG IN TRIAL COURT SL PANELRO SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD N
07/03/1989STATEMENT TO 6-27-89 ORDER PENDING 23-110 MOTION. PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD STATE
09/12/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO ADVISE OF STATUS OF 23-110 MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989STATEMENT RE COURT ORDER RE 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD STATE
11/02/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO PLACE CASE ON THE OURT'S BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 40 DAYS; APLE'S BRIEF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD V
12/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 1, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD BA
01/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/02/1990STATEMENT OF APLT RE PAGES OF TRANSCRIPT THAT ARE PERTINENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER DIRG CLERK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; FO APLE'S BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-13-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BE
02/20/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT'S AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE RE: ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO WITH- DRAW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-12-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990LETTER RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 19, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (16 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 22 THRU 31 SL PANELRO SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD Q
06/06/1990APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING SMA UP TO AND INCLUDING 7/6/90. NFX FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (SUPPLEMENTAL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990RECEIVED APLT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL SUP BRF; APLE MAY FL SUP BRF IN 14 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 072490 SCHPRD OPA
09/27/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELNWWGTE SCDATE 092790 SCHPRD CREG
10/04/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD