judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD B. WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0949
Short Caption:REGINALD B. WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6295-88Filed Date:09/20/1989

Opening Event Date:09/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/18/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantReginald White N
Carmen A. Jacobs YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James F. Rutherford YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, REGINALD B. UNITED STATES
09/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/20/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/18/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD R
01/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD V
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD BE
10/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1990REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV ORDER ON APPEAL/ CAUSE RM FOR FURTHER PRCDGS. PANELRGBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 582 A.2d 1199
12/07/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 3698
12/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD