judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

QUYWANA ANDERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1220
Short Caption:QUYWANA ANDERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3496-89Filed Date:10/12/1989

Opening Event Date:10/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/11/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantQuywana Anderson N
James W. Richmond, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Eileen F. Sheehan YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ANDERSON, QUYWANA a/k/a GARY E. PHILLIPS UNITED STATES
10/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES W. RICHMOND, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
11/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL 32-PGS (FINNERIN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (279-PGS/RHOADES) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 010690 SCHPRD BA
01/19/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD V
09/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL BRF & LODGED BA IS FILED; F/O APLE'S BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS.GW PANELRBH SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD B
10/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD BE
06/11/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/11/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/22/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD