judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THEODORE RICH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0612
Short Caption:THEODORE RICH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2395-89Filed Date:06/01/1989

Opening Event Date:06/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/23/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheodore Rich N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICH, THEODORE UNITED STATES
06/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD DSA
08/23/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/23/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD R
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
09/11/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED AS SUPP. REC. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (67 PGS. -- FISHER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010690 SCHPRD RT
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
04/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BE
11/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/07/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGFAPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFAPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/04/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD