judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOE L. ROSE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0660
Short Caption:JOE L. ROSE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4450-89Filed Date:05/24/1989

Opening Event Date:05/24/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/22/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoe L. Rose N
Jack Koppelman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gilberto De Jesus YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROSE, JOE L. UNITED STATES
05/24/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/07/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JACK KOPPELMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD DSA
08/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (33 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD R
09/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
10/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/22/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD