Case: 01-10-00684-CR
01-10-00684-CR
08/05/2010
Capital Murder
Frank Anthony Benitez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/30/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State | |
03/23/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/2014 | Case stored | | |||||
05/18/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
03/16/2012 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
12/30/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
12/21/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||
12/15/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
12/15/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
10/25/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
10/03/2011 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
07/14/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/01/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/30/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
06/30/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/21/2011 | State brief due | | |||||
06/17/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
05/24/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/05/2011 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
04/22/2011 | State brief due | | |||||
03/23/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
03/21/2011 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/16/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
02/11/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/11/2011 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/13/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
12/22/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/22/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
11/25/2010 | Record due | | |||||
11/22/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
08/24/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
08/23/2010 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
08/05/2010 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
08/05/2010 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
07/28/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/28/2010 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/02/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/17/2037 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Carol M. Cameron Patricia Rae R. Lykos |
Benitez, Frank Anthony | Criminal - Appellant | Wayne T. Hill |
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Hon. Belinda Hill
1241615
Life