judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. FAGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1196
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. FAGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1373-88Filed Date:09/16/1988

Opening Event Date:09/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/05/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Fagan N
Jensen E. Barber YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FAGAN, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/26/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO EXT TM TO FL HIS BRF & CLK NOTE - 02 TO FL BRF OF APLT; GRANT MO NOTE - 02 OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL ITS NOTE - 03 BRF BY 10/31/90; NFX. NOTE - 03
09/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JENSEN E. BARBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD DSA
09/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD R
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD U
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (7-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD RT
03/08/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR JACKSON CERTIFICATION OF 7/14/89 PROC (NOT W/JUDGE THIS DATE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR FINNERIN CERTIFICATION OF 7/14/89 PROC. (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(65 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(188 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD RT
07/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD CHECK
08/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
08/28/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD B
10/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 103190 SCHPRD BE
03/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/05/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD