Case: 01-09-00281-CV
01-09-00281-CV
03/30/2009
Contract
Vinmar Trade Finance, Ltd.
Utility Trailers De Mexico, S.A. DE C.V., Tractocamiones Kenworth De Monterrey, S.A. DE C.V., San Antonio Trade Group, Inc. and Andrew W. Parker
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2011 | Letter brief filed | Appellee | |
01/26/2011 | Letter brief filed | Appellee | |
01/26/2011 | Letter brief filed | Appellee | |
01/21/2011 | Post submission brief filed | Appellant | |
10/09/2009 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
09/18/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
08/19/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/09/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
05/20/2011 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
03/25/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/10/2011 | Opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
03/10/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
01/28/2011 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
01/26/2011 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
01/26/2011 | Letter brief filed | | |||||
01/21/2011 | Post submission brief filed | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
12/27/2010 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
10/23/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/22/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/09/2009 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
10/08/2009 | Reply brief due | | |||||
10/01/2009 | Motion disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
09/28/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
09/18/2009 | Motion filed | | |||||
09/18/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/18/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
09/18/2009 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
08/25/2009 | Record checked in | | |||||
08/20/2009 | Record checked out | | |||||
08/19/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
08/17/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
07/21/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/20/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/18/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
07/17/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/29/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
06/25/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
06/19/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/18/2009 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/09/2009 | Record checked in | | |||||
06/05/2009 | Record checked out | | |||||
06/04/2009 | Reporters record due | | |||||
05/28/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
05/19/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
05/07/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
05/04/2009 | Letter filed | | |||||
05/04/2009 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||
05/01/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
04/24/2009 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
04/17/2009 | Document filed | | |||||
04/15/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
04/13/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
04/10/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
04/06/2009 | Record due | | |||||
04/02/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed | | |||||
04/02/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
04/01/2009 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
03/30/2009 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
03/30/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
03/27/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/08/2009 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/09/2017 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
08/08/2011 | Retention | Strip file 60 days after issuance of mandate |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Vinmar Trade Finance, Ltd. | Appellant | Elizabeth G. Bloch Stephen W. Lemmon Kell Corrigan Mercer |
Utility Trailers De Mexico, S.A. DE C.V., Tractocamiones Kentworth De Monterrey, S.A. DE C.V., San Antonio Trade Group, Inc. and Andrew W. Parker | Appellee | William A. Worthington Wanda Fowler |
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Robert Schaffer
0754944