judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES A. FAIRNOT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1265
Short Caption:JAMES A. FAIRNOT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8126-86Filed Date:09/23/1988

Opening Event Date:09/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames A. Fairnot N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FAIRNOT, JAMES A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 (FELONY-DRUG) NOTE - 01
05/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (8 PGS/SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/18/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD DSA
02/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD R
04/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 06-15-90. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD Q
06/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BA
06/14/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/14/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN MOTION. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD