judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY E. SESSONS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1289
Short Caption:ANTHONY E. SESSONS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3880-80Filed Date:10/04/1988

Opening Event Date:10/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony E. Sessons N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SESSONS, ANTHONY E. UNITED STATES
10/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/21/1988ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD Q
11/29/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/29/1988ORDER CASE DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD Q
11/29/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD