judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BERNARD JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0016
Short Caption:BERNARD JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9230-88Filed Date:01/03/1989

Opening Event Date:01/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBernard Johnson N
Valerie S. Bailey YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, BERNARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FO THAT VALERIE BAILEY, ESQ. NOTE - 01 IS APTD. TO REPT APLT; FO THAT NOTE - 02 CLERK, SUPER CT IS DIRED TO NOTE - 02 TRANSMIT REC W/OUT FEE. FVH
01/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER DIRG DR/SRT &50 FEE BE FLD W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPEAL SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JANUARY 27TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD DR
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VALERIE S. BAILEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989ORDER VACATING THIS COURT'S ORD OF 1/27/89 & DIRG CLERK TO FILE LODGED DSA (SEE NOTES 1 & 2) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD R
03/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD M
08/24/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (244 PGS RT - FRANKLIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD RT
09/29/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 4, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110389 SCHPRD BE
11/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/13/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION TO REMAND APPEAL TO TRIAL COURT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD