judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES B. FIELDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0039
Short Caption:JAMES B. FIELDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7886-88Filed Date:12/30/1988

Opening Event Date:12/30/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/07/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/21/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/09/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/02/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames B. Fields N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Guizelous O. Molock YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FIELDS, JAMES B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
12/30/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/27/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE L. RICHARDSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD DSA
06/07/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD R
08/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (344 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD RT
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLA MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/6/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD M
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD BA
10/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 7, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110789 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INC. 12/7/89. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-21-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 120789 SCHPRD BE
12/15/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 12/21/89. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/21/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(6 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1990LETTER TO APLT RETURNING THE PET FOR REHEARING - CASE NOT DECIDED SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1990APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING IF COUNSEL IS OUT OF TOWN WHILE CASE IS DECIDED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990LETTER RETURNING PET FOR REHEARING TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELRBH SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD N
04/09/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/09/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION APPEALED FRM PANELRGWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/24/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN US SUPREME COURT DATED 8/29/91 #91-5681 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied
01/10/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN US SUPREME COURT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD