judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1521
Short Caption:WILLIAM MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7417-88Filed Date:12/28/1989

Opening Event Date:12/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Moore N
Barry Y. ShimamuraYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin Ohlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOORE, WILLIAM UNITED STATES
12/28/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/10/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARRY Y. SHIMAMURA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD DSA
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD R
06/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (200-PGS/HART) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052590 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BE
07/23/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD