judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL RAHIM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1541
Short Caption:ABDUL RAHIM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F20615-77Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdul Rahim N
Barbara L. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAHIM, ABDUL AKA PHILIP YOUNG UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 8901542 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 2/28/90 ORD: DENYING MO TO NOTE - 02 DISMISS W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL NOTE - 03 W/IN 20 DAYS PROVIDED APLT NOTE - 03 SUBMITS A STMT IN COMPLIANCE NOTE - 04 WITH JOHNSON V. U.S. NOTE - 04
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/09/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD R
01/16/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD TO
04/17/1990RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APLT IN 89-1463 IN ACCORDANCE W/JOHNSON V. US. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990STATEMENT OF APLT IN NO. 89-1542 IN ACCORDANCE WITH JOHNSON V US AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER APLT NOT HAVING FILED A STMT RE JOHNSON V. US, BRIEF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD CHECK
08/01/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE HIS BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPEAL SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/22/1991ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S 4/1/90 ORDER AD PANELRO SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD BA
04/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD