judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLIFFORD DEVON SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0463
Short Caption:CLIFFORD DEVON SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Lead: 89-CM-0462 Consolidated:89-CM-0463
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M12480-88Filed Date:04/19/1989

Opening Event Date:04/19/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/26/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClifford Devon Smith N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Nancy R. Page YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, CLIFFORD DEVON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-462 NOTE - 01
04/19/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989ORDER SS, CONS THIS CASE W/89-462. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-462 (220 PGS. -- VAN BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112389 SCHPRD RT
07/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD R
08/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17 PGS RT - WILLIAMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD RT
12/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(110 PGS/FARMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD RT
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1990ORDER APLT TO FILE STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDRD & COMPLETION DATE JB PANELRBH SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD U
04/30/1990STATEMENT OF APLT RE TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD STATE
05/22/1990ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED IN THIS COURT JB PANELRBH SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD U
08/24/1990FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (18-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD RT
09/13/1990ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 40 DAYS. NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD B
10/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 102390 SCHPRD BA
11/26/1990FiledBriefing Completed
11/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 112690 SCHPRD BE
04/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/01/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -WA CITE 593 A.2d 205
06/25/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - WA PAGE # - 1864
07/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD