judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUGH C. SHEARS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0518
Short Caption:HUGH C. SHEARS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11927-88Filed Date:05/12/1989

Opening Event Date:05/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/08/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHugh C. Shears N
Nicholas J. Hluchyj YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Diane M. Munson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SHEARS, HUGH C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/05/08 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HLUCHYJN FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MUNSOND FOR - APPELLEE
05/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NICHOLAS J. HLUCHYJ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE THE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD DSA
08/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (122 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD R
09/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 21, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 102589 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/21/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD V
11/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-12-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE DAY AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER GRTG MOTIONS AND DIRG CLERK TO FILE APLE'S LODGED BRIEF. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/08/1990ARGUED PANELRGFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD