judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUSSELL W. GALBERTH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0382
Short Caption:RUSSELL W. GALBERTH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13787-88Filed Date:04/25/1989

Opening Event Date:04/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRussell Galberth N
Virginia C. Lindsay NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
John M. CopacinoYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Kathleen A. Felton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GALBERTH, RUSSELL W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/12/90 ORD: GRANTG MO TO NOTE - 01 CNSOLIDATE 89-382 & 89-1008; NOTE - 02 GRANTG MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 02 FILE BRIEF TO 1/17/90; CONSOL NOTE - 03 BRIEF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFT NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT IN 89-382 IS FLD.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - REISERD FOR - APLT TAYLOR ATTY 2 - COPACINOJ FOR - APLT GALBERTH ATTY 3 - FELTONK FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 LINDSAYV VACATED 9/11/90
04/25/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989ORDER APPOINTING VIRGINIA C. LINDSAY AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. GG PANELRO SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD R
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(6 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (131 PGS RT - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD M
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1990 NO OPE AJ PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 89-1008 (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD Q
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 16, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BA
01/29/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INC. 2/16/90; FO BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD BA
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(EXHIBITS 1,2) BROWN ENVELOPE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 12, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD BE
04/11/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/12/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD B
04/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041290 SCHPRD BE
04/30/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO MAY 18, 1990 ( NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF IN NO. 89-382 TO 5/18/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD RBA
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN 89-1008 (NO OPE) JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN 89-1008. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD VS
09/05/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 89-1008 MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/11/1990ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (53 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1991REVERSED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION (#89-1008 = RECORD RM) PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RV METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 590 A.2d 990
04/30/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 1193
05/09/1991ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS SEVERED FROM NO. 89-1008 FOR PURPOSE OF ISSUANCE OF MANDATE SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLE - TO 2 WEEKS PMB NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 5/28/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 052491 SCHPRD CHECK
06/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT IN 89-1008 FOR EXPEDITED ISSUANCE OF THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD