judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH AVENT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0455
Short Caption:KENNETH AVENT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7404-88Filed Date:03/31/1989

Opening Event Date:03/31/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth Avent N
John J. Mccabe, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AVENT, KENNETH UNITED STATES
03/31/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN J. McCABE, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD DSA
08/08/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD R
12/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(185-PGS) WATKINS AJ PANEL SCDATE 121089 SCHPRD RT
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 15, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/15/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1990LETTER RE ANDERS MOTION MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1991AFFIRMED MO TO W/D AS COUNS FOR APLT IS GRANTD; F/O & ADJ THAT JUDGMNT ON APPEAL BE, & IS, AFFIMED.GW PANELRBH SCDATE 011891 SCHPRD VS
02/04/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
02/25/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD