judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM RANSOM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0958
Short Caption:WILLIAM RANSOM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6852-86Filed Date:08/06/1987

Opening Event Date:08/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/31/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Ransom N
Thomas Reed Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Celillianne Green YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RANSOM, WILLIAM UNITED STATES
08/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS REED KENNEDY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD R
07/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (19 PGS - JACKSON) JB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
07/27/1988ORDER DENY CT RPTR REQ FOR EXT TO 2/15/89 TO FILE RT; 5/5-5/8/87 RT DUE 10/14/88 -ANFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(306 PGS/ WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD RT
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-16-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/16/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD BA
02/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-21-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/21/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD CHECK
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-28-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD BE
04/17/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/28/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD OPA
04/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 042889 SCHPRD BE
10/31/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/31/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPELED FROM PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD