judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAAQUANETTA M. ALSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0186
Short Caption:LAAQUANETTA M. ALSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M11761-88Filed Date:02/27/1989

Opening Event Date:02/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/30/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLaaquanetta M. Alston N
Shailly P. Agnihotri NN
AppellantM. Laaquanetta Alsont N
John M. CopacinoNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALSTON, LAAQUANETTA M. AKA LAAQUANETTA A. GERMAN-BEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 112289 ORD: GRANT MO TO WITH- NOTE - 01 DRAW, SHAILLY P. AGNIHOTRI, NOTE - 02 ESQ. VACATED; JOHN M. COPACINO NOTE - 02 ESQ. APPOINTED TO REPRESENT NOTE - 03 APLT; GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT NOTE - 03 TM TO FL BRF TO 12/18/89. NOTE - 04 04/10/90 ORD:DENY APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 04 VOL WITHDRAW APPEAL W/O PREJ. NOTE - 05 TO RENEWAL IN 20 DAYS,PROVIDED NOTE - 05 APLT SUPPORTS SUCH MO WITH AN NOTE - 06 AFFIDAVIT ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 06 JOHNSON V. JOHNSON V. U.S., NOTE - 07 513 A.2d (D.C. 1986). NOTE - 07
01/01/1906 AGNIHOTRIS VACATED: 11/22/89
02/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1989ORDER SS, SHAILLY AGNIHOTRI APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD DSA
06/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 042889 SCHPRD R
07/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989ORDER APLT BRF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD U
09/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/21/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(205 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APLT; TO APPOINT JOHN CAPACINO & MXBE TO 12-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD M
12/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-27-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD M
01/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-27-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 012790 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/27/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD V
02/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07 GW PANELRO SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD V
05/07/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR 30 DAY EXT. TO FILE STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO TO X TM TO FL A STATEMENT; APLT SHALL FL STATE W/IN 30 DAYS. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
07/02/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT LAAQUANETTA ALSTON AD PANEL SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD STATE
07/06/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/06/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO W/D CASE & CASE IS DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD CHECK
07/06/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/30/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD