judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT C. MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0959
Short Caption:ROBERT C. MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8894-86Filed Date:08/05/1987

Opening Event Date:08/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/02/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/08/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert C. Moore N
Dorothy E. Nelms YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOORE, ROBERT C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/21/88 ORD GRT APLT MO FO NOTE - 01 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/7/89 NOTE - 02 ANY FURTHER REQUEST FOR AN EXT NOTE - 02 OF TM WILL BE LOOKED UPON W/ NOTE - 03 DISFAVOR AND GRANTED ONLY IN NOTE - 03 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES.
08/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DOROTHY E. NELMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD R
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (94 PGS - CALHOUN) JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
12/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 15TH JB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMP OF RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD EBP
03/17/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (63 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040188 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 7, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-3 PB PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD V
01/09/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010789 SCHPRD BA
02/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL THIRTY (30) DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS DOCKETED (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 30 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD CHECK
06/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (39 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1989ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 10 OR CASE TO BE SCHED ON RECORD & BRF OF APLT ALONE. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/02/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/08/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD