judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARL B. GILLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1183
Short Caption:CARL B. GILLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12377-87Filed Date:09/08/1988

Opening Event Date:09/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/30/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarl B. Gillis N
Richard K. Gilbert YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Leslie A. Blackmon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GILLIS, CARL B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-1182 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 9/12/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 02 TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 03 TO TRANSMIT THE ID DOCUMENTS NOTE - 03 IN THIS CASE TO THIS CRT AS A NOTE - 04 SUPP REC; GRANT MO OF APLT FOR NOTE - 04 LV & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; NOTE - 05 GRANT MO OF APLE & CLK TO FL NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLE; SCHED CASE AS NOTE - 06 SOON AS CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GILBERTR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKMONL FOR - APPELLEE
09/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/23/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD K. GILBERT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD DSA
10/07/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, CON W/88-1182 BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (102 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (195 PGS MOLLICHELLI) RTC IN 88-1182 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/30/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(299 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 24, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD OPE
07/24/1989APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-26-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-7-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD Q
09/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ID DOCUMENTS AD PANEL SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD SR
09/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AND PERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (APLT) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 14, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE REPLY BRF AND SUPPL BRF AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED BRFS SL PANELRONWPY SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD VS
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989ARGUED PANELRGNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/12/1989APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO FILE SUPPL. BRF AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED SUPPL BRF OF APLE SL PANELRONWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990ORDER DENIYNG PETITION FOR REHEARING GW PANELRONWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990LETTER TO APP. COOR. RETURNING ENVELOPE MARKED EXHIBITS (IDENTIFICATION DOC.) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD