judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY

Case Information: 86-CV-0665
Short Caption:BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1090-79Filed Date:04/21/1986

Opening Event Date:04/21/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/20/1987
Argued/Submitted:09/29/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John T. Irick NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joseph D. Gallagher NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Alan C. Anderson YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Rachel S. Garron NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald G. GuziakYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BALTIMORE, ROBERT L. B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/6/86 ORD: VACATING NOTE - 01 APPEARANCES OF JOHN T. IRICK, NOTE - 02 ESQ., AND JOSEPH T. GALLAGHER, NOTE - 02 ESQ., AS COUNSEL FOR APLT; NO NOTE - 03 7A; APLT TO FILE DR/SRT IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 8/8/88 ORD: APLT IN 10 DAYS TO NOTE - 04 ADVISE CRT OF IDENTITY OF NOTE - 05 COUNSEL REPRESENTNG HIM WHETHR NOTE - 05 OR NOT THE PET FOR REH EN BANC NOTE - 06 RECVD IS PROPERLY BRFORE CRT. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 10/28/88 ORD: DENY APLT'S PET NOTE - 07 FOR REHEARING. FO THAT THE PET NOTE - 08 OF JOHN T. IRICK, ESQ., FOR NOTE - 08 REH EN BANC IS DENIED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/09/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ANDERSONALA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GUZIAKR FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 IRICKJ VACATED 8/6/86 GALLAGHERJ VACATED 8/6/86
04/21/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/05/1986RECEIVED CAS FROM MR GALLAGHER MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1986RECEIVED FILING FEE OF $50 FROM MR GALLAGHER MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 050686 SCHPRD CAS
05/06/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1986COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (JOSEPH D. GALLAGHER) AS COUNSEL - APLT'S CONSENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062386 SCHPRD CHECK
07/25/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE FILING FEE FROM MR IRICK MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1986MEMORANDUM REFUNDING $50 FILING FEE TO J.D. GALLAGHER-VOUCHER #RV6037 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELMK SCDATE 070986 SCHPRD CHECK
08/18/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 081886 SCHPRD DR
09/24/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1,128 PGS - SCHOCH) 3 VOLUMES JB PANEL SCDATE 082886 SCHPRD RT
10/16/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 1 BROWN ENVELOPE) (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 100686 SCHPRD R
10/21/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/25/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS GG PANEL SCDATE 120186 SCHPRD BA
12/17/1986ORDER GRANT MO; APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD OPE
01/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 26TH JB PANEL SCDATE 011687 SCHPRD BA
02/18/1987ORDER GRANT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BR OF APLT SHALL BE FILED WITHIN 10 DAYS; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 012787 SCHPRD OPE
03/02/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD BA
04/02/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG TTC PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD BE
04/20/1987FiledBriefing Completed
04/20/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1987RECEIVED AMMENDED PAGE TO APPELLEE'S BRIEF. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/29/1987ARGUED PANELPYTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL RE EXPEDITION OF A DECISION IN THIS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 545 A.2d 1228
06/30/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 1159
07/14/1988APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REHEARING GT PANEL SCDATE 081888 SCHPRD ANSA
09/14/1988MOTION FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING EN BANC OF COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT (JOHN IRICK) SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988MOTION FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING EN BANC BY JOHN T. IRICK, ESQ. SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988ORDER GRT MO OF JOHN T. IRICK, ESQ., FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REH EB AND CLK TO FILE LODGED PET. SL PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD OPE
10/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 AND 8 SL PANELEB SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD VS
11/04/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD