judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SCHUBINER, JARED M. POPHAM, HAIK, SCHNOBRICH,

Case Information: 86-CV-0624
Short Caption:SCHUBINER, JARED M. POPHAM, HAIK, SCHNOBRICH,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA300-85Filed Date:04/07/1986

Opening Event Date:04/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/16/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/02/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/10/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Edward W. Abramowitz NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard N. Bloom YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James Douglas Welch YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SCHUBINER, JARED M. ET AL POPHAM, HAIK, SCHNOBRICH, KAUFMAN & DOTY, LTD
01/01/1906 BLOOMR PRO HAC VICE
04/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/16/1986FiledRecord Completed
10/02/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/12/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition