judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00397-CR
04-89-00397-CR
08/17/1989
Burglary
Moreno, Esteban Martinez
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/26/1989Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/20/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/04/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/27/1989No Description Available.
06/08/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
05/18/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
05/03/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1989Case StoredCase stored
12/21/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Manuel R. Flores
21551
17 years TDC