judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00575-CR
14-81-00575-CR
12/10/1980
Other Drug Possession
Rodriguez-Salinas, Genaro
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1983Mandate Issued
06/02/1983No description available.
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/20/1983Submission
05/19/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/19/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
03/24/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
01/14/1982Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
10/01/1981Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
12/10/1980Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
318,903
12 yrs.