judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01760-CV
05-96-01760-CV
11/05/1996
Negligence tort, other
Francisco Castro
Sable Homes, Inc., Demetrio Figueroa And Larry Roberts D/B/A Larry Roberts' Paint Contracting
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/29/2016Letter issued by the court
05/27/1999Record RetentionDestroy
04/13/1999Mandate Issued
04/13/1999Mandate Issued
02/03/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/03/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1999Submission
01/12/1999Submitted
01/12/1999Submission
01/12/1999Submitted
03/28/1997MattConv
03/26/1997Brief Filed
03/26/1997Case ready to be set
03/26/1997Case ready to be set
03/22/1997MattConv
02/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/26/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/20/1997Objection DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Brief Filed
02/17/1997MattConv
02/06/1997Objection Filed
01/31/1997Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1997ADR Referral Order IssuedReferred to Mediation
01/29/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1997Response to Motion
01/21/1997Response to Motion
01/18/1997MattConv
01/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/17/1997MattConv
01/17/1997Motion to Supplement Record
01/17/1997Statement of Facts Filed
12/20/1996MattConv
12/19/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/05/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellee
12/05/1996MattConv
12/05/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
11/21/199650.00 Fee Paid
11/20/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/15/1996MattConv
11/05/1996Record due
11/05/1996Transcript Filed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/27/1996Affidavit Filed
08/07/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/08/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sable Homes, Inc., Demetrio FiAppelleeMr. Gregg William Hill
Jennifer D. Aufricht
David Adair Mcfarland
Wade Caven Crosnoe
Castro, FranciscoAppellantManuel Rios
Demetrio FigueroaAppelleeDemetrio Figueroa
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Anne Ashby
93-04427-G