judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01161-CR
05-89-01161-CR
09/28/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hudson, Reginal Dwight
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/24/1991Mandate Issued
06/24/1991Mandate Issued
06/17/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/17/1991Order entered
02/28/1991Letter Sent by the Court
02/28/1991Letter Sent by the Court
02/27/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
01/17/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
01/14/1991Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/10/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1990Submission
10/12/1990Submitted
10/12/1990Submission
10/12/1990Submitted
09/24/1990MattConv
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
06/13/1990Brief Filed
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
05/30/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1990Brief Filed
03/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/12/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/11/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/15/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/16/1989Transcript Filed
10/10/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1989Extend Time to File Record
10/03/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/12/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
04/20/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/24/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F88-85541-S
50 yrs TDC