judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1319-89
PD-1319-89
09/29/1989
PDR Case Type
FOBES, KENNETH ALVIN, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/27/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/1990FINAL DISPRefused
01/17/1990PDR DISPRefused
11/27/1989RESPONSE FILED
10/23/1989EXT RESPONSE DISPGranted
10/23/1989EXT RESPONSE FILED
09/29/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/16/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateWilliam R. Turner
FOBES, KENNETH ALVINJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)William W. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
14-89-00101-CR
Aff 8-31-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JOHN M. DELANEY
18,225-272