judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6555
B-6555
02/14/1977
Application for Writ of Error
BILLY H. LEE, M.D.
BRENDA ANDREWS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF ESTATE OF JOE BERT ANDREWS AND SONJA ANDREWS (MINORS), AND JOE BERT ANDREWS, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
02/14/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/14/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1977Motion to dismissFiling granted
03/01/1977Response to Petition
02/14/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/14/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brenda Andrews, individually and as Independent Executrix of Estate of Joe Bert Andrews and Sonja Andrews (minors), and Joe Bert Andrews, Sr.Respondent
Billy H. Lee, M.D.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information