judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9775
A-9775
08/08/1963
Application for Writ of Error
HUGHES ENGINEERING COMPANY
DOVIE ELIZABETH EUBANKS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/17/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1963Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/18/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/23/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/17/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1963Supplemental Brief filed
09/18/1963Reply to Response
08/23/1963Response to Petition
08/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/08/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hughes Engineering CompanyPetitioner
Dovie Elizabeth Eubanks, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information