judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00053-CR
05-82-00053-CR
01/07/1982
Burglary of a Habitation
Michael Wayne Hicks
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/20/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
04/18/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/20/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/18/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/18/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/06/1982Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1982Motion to reconsider filed
10/05/1982Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
09/10/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/04/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/23/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/15/1982Letter issued by the court
03/10/1982Reporters record filed
03/10/1982Clerks record filed
01/07/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/18/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hicks, Michael WayneCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F80-10007-MKN
Life TDC