judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-82-00007-CV
08-82-00007-CV
01/07/1982
Contract
Torres, Antonio
Members Mutual Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
10/06/1983Mandate Issued
07/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/22/1982Submitted
08/18/1982Submission
03/19/1982Brief Filed
03/17/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/19/1982Brief Filed
01/20/1982Exhibits Filed
01/20/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/20/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/20/1982Statement of Facts Filed
01/20/1982Transcript Filed
01/07/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
01/07/1982Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/06/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 4
El Paso
47133-4
N/A