judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1306-89
PD-1306-89
09/26/1989
PDR Case Type
BRASHEAR, WALTER L.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/29/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/27/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/26/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
BRASHEAR, WALTER L.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Keith E. Jagmin
Court of Appeals Information:
11-89-00043-CR
Aff 8-17-89
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable GERRY MEIER
F88-92187-JU