judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00965-CR
01-89-00965-CR
09/26/1989
Other Drug Possession
Jones, William
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/18/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/26/1991Date final opinion release for publication
11/23/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
11/08/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
10/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1991Submitted
04/23/1991Submission
04/23/1991Submitted
02/21/1991Submission
12/21/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1990Case ready to be set
11/20/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/08/1990Statement of facts filed
10/08/1990Supplemental transcript filed
09/19/1990Date final opinion release for publication
08/09/1990Order enteredAbate case
06/05/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
03/12/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/12/1990Case ready to be set
02/22/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/22/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/07/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/05/1990Statement of facts filed
11/30/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/20/1989Transcript filed
11/14/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/26/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/22/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
09/22/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. Robert N. Kepple
StateCriminal - AppellantLarry Price Urquhart
StateCriminal - State of TexasJ. Harvey Hudson
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StatePRO SE
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
532,010
35 yrs tdc