judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00048-CR
14-82-00048-CR
01/12/1982
Robbery
Rigsby, Charles Lee
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/23/1983Mandate Issued
05/20/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
05/03/1983No description available.
03/24/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/21/1983Submission
08/23/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/22/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/12/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/12/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
01/10/1982No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
343,418
Life