judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1161-89
PD-1161-89
08/16/1989
PDR Case Type
KLASING, WILLIAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/13/1990BRIEF FILEDState
12/05/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/1991MANDATE ISSD
05/01/1991OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA & Trial Court
08/29/1990ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIESFiled
05/30/1990SUBMITTED
03/16/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
03/13/1990BRIEF FILED
03/12/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
03/12/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
02/05/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
02/05/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
01/05/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
01/05/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/05/1989BRIEF FILED
11/08/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/26/1989SUPP PDR MOTION TOFiled
10/26/1989SUPP PDR MOTION TOGranted
10/26/1989SUPPLEMENT TO PDR FILED
09/18/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/16/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/17/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Klasing, WilliamApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Douglas Tinker
STATE OF TEXASStateCarlos Valdez
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00117-CR
Aff 5-18-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable ROBERT BLACKMON
82-CR-289-B