judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-82-00003-CR
14-82-00003-CR
01/22/1982
Other Drug Possession
Schwartz, Neil Adam
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/1985Mandate Issued
06/13/1985Motion to issue mandate DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/06/1985Motion to issue mandate FILED
05/02/1985Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/13/1985Case reinstated
02/20/1985Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
10/20/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewGRANTED
07/14/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/05/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/28/1983No description available.
05/19/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
11/22/1982Submission
06/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
05/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/07/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
12/22/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/13/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Patricia Saum
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWendell A. Odom, Jr.
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
338,253
7 yrs. TDC