judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00344-CR
04-81-00344-CR
01/21/1982
Other Drug Possession
Ezebb, Jr., Raymond S.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/19/1983Mandate Issued
09/19/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
09/19/1983Mandate Issued
07/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1982Submission
12/14/1982Submission
12/14/1982Submitted
03/01/1982Case ready to be set
03/01/1982Brief Filed
03/01/1982Case ready to be set
02/05/1982Brief Filed
01/21/1982Record Filed
01/19/1982Record Approved
09/24/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
09/24/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
78-CR-0581
5 Years