judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00045-CR
05-82-00045-CR
01/06/1982
Aggravated Rape
Marvin Ray Edwards
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/17/1982Supplemental brief filedPro Se
09/03/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedPro Se
08/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
06/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
01/09/1987Letter issued by the court
02/21/1984Letter received
02/09/1984Letter issued by the court
12/15/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/28/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
08/30/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
08/25/1983Letter issued by the court
08/24/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1983Motion to expedite filed
02/16/1983Letter received
12/29/1982Letter issued by the court
12/15/1982Letter received
09/17/1982Supplemental brief filed
09/03/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/28/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
05/25/1982Clerks record filed
05/25/1982Reporters record filed
04/30/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/16/1982Letter issued by the court
02/08/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/06/1982Docketing statement filed
01/06/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edwards, Marvin RayCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F81-3915-NM
51 years TDC & 5000.00 fine