judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9050
C-9050
09/12/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
THE HONORABLE CHARLES A. DICKERSON, JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/1989Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
09/15/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/11/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
12/11/1989Exhibits returned to the lower court clerks'IN CAMERA' EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANS. CO. , ROY MCCUTCHEON, ATTORNEY.
10/25/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledW/MO TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IS OR
10/25/1989Motion to Stay DisposedOverruled
10/20/1989Motion to Stay Filed
10/16/1989Exhibits received'IN CAMERA' ENVELOPE
10/09/1989Call receivedFR/KATHRYN COX, CLERK OF 1ST CA,THAT THIS MAND.IS STILL PENDING IN THEIR CT--THEY HAVE ONLY RULED ON MO/TEMP RELIEF
09/15/1989Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/15/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
09/14/1989Exhibits received
09/14/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/14/1989No description available.
09/14/1989Petition for writ received
09/14/1989Statement of Facts received
09/13/1989Motion for temporary relief
09/13/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/11/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RUSSELL RENNICKRespondentMr. David P. Willis
DALE MCANDREWSRespondentMr. Dale F. Carrington
RAY RAMIREZRespondentMr. Bret Walton
CHRISTOPHER RAMIREZRespondentMr. Bret Walton
MATTHEW MCANDREWSRespondentMr. Dale F. Carrington
ALMA G. RENNICKRespondentMr. David P. Willis
Court of Appeals Information:
01-89-00899-CV
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable Charles A. Dickerson
62,601