Case: 07-12-00328-CV
07-12-00328-CV
07/23/2012
Personal Injury
Janet Bontke, Individually and as Guardian of the Estate and Person of Nolan Bontke, a Ward
Cargill Meat Logistics Solution, Inc., Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation and Tulia Feed Lot, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/2013 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
04/25/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
04/02/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/04/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/01/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
06/16/2014 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
04/14/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
02/04/2014 | Letter filed | | |||||||
06/03/2013 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/13/2013 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
05/09/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/09/2013 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
04/25/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
04/12/2013 | Response filed | | |||||||
04/12/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
04/12/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed | | |||||||
04/08/2013 | Letter filed | | |||||||
04/02/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
04/01/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
04/01/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
03/28/2013 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||||
03/08/2013 | Record checked out | | |||||||
03/08/2013 | Record checked out | | |||||||
03/08/2013 | Letter filed | | |||||||
03/04/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
02/28/2013 | Record checked out | | |||||||
02/27/2013 | Letter filed | | |||||||
01/31/2013 | Supplemental reporters record filed | | |||||||
01/31/2013 | Letter filed | | |||||||
01/24/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
01/24/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
01/02/2013 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/27/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/20/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/14/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/13/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/13/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
12/10/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/10/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
12/05/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
10/31/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
10/30/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
10/10/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
10/08/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
10/03/2012 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||||
10/02/2012 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||||
10/01/2012 | Response filed | | |||||||
09/19/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
08/30/2012 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
08/13/2012 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
08/13/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
08/13/2012 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
08/13/2012 | Response filed | | |||||||
08/08/2012 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||||
08/08/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
07/30/2012 | Response filed | | |||||||
07/24/2012 | Letter received | | |||||||
07/24/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed | | |||||||
07/24/2012 | Fee paid | | |||||||
07/23/2012 | Fee requested | | |||||||
07/23/2012 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
07/23/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/19/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
05/14/2012 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
04/13/2012 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/01/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Tulia Feed Lots, Inc. | Appellee | Thomas D. Farris |
Cargill Meat Logistic Solutions, Inc. | Appellee | Slater C. Elza S. Tom Morris |
Bontke, Janet | Appellant | Judson Waltman J. Paul Manning Anna McKim W. Mark Lanier |
Trial Court Information
64th District Court
Swisher
Honorable Robert W. Kinkaid, Jr.
A-11598-10-06