judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VAN NORT (SCOTTIE) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 47893
Short Caption:VAN NORT (SCOTTIE) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48027 , 48057
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 32071AClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/22/2006Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Issuance of Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. (Emergency Consideration Requested.) 06-17451
09/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-19324
09/26/2006Other Returned Mail. Order Denying Petition addressed to Scottie Ray Van Nort returned. No forwarding address.
10/17/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-20879
10/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2006Other Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur addressed to Scottie Ray Van Nort returned. No forwarding address.