judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURTON VS. HERR

Case Information: 47884
Short Caption:BURTON VS. HERRCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45443
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A475088Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 06-17391
08/28/2006BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 06-17791
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A475088: 120 days. 06-20624
10/18/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn7[We vacate our October 9, 2006 order directing the district court to transmit the record in the underlying case.] NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-21468
10/30/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Reconsideration and Affidavit. 06-22119
11/13/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-23150
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/08/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-24102
12/08/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/14/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 11, 2006. 06-24102