judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALGREEN COMPANY VS. MOWEN

Case Information: 43992
Short Caption:WALGREEN COMPANY VS. MOWENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A435945Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/2004 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 106591.
09/24/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17705
09/30/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgments and/or Notices of Entry filed 2/12/04. Due Date: 10 days
10/05/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/07/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Two Verdict Forms and two Notices of Entry of Judgment filed in district court on December 17, 2003. 04-18632
10/12/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (district court documents)
10/13/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-18978
10/18/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19243
12/17/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Christiansen Law Offices 04-23067
02/14/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-02887
02/22/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-03526
03/11/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/01/03, 12/02/03, 12/03/03, 12/05/03, 12/08/03, 12/10/03, 12/11/03, 12/15/03, 12/16/03, 12/17/03, 04/12/04, 11/10/03, 11/05/03, 10/02/03, 09/22/03, 06/25/03, 06/23/03, and 05/28/03. To Court Reporter: Joanie Grime, Jo A. Scott, and Gina Shrader. 05-04920
05/06/2005Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Gina M. Shrader. No payment has been received for transcripts. 05-08946
05/31/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
06/13/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. to Continue Briefing Pending Completion of Settlement. 05-11557
07/05/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-13236
07/12/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[The June 13, 2005, stipulation to continue the briefing schedule is disapproved as moot.] fn2[Because the parties have reached a settlement of this matter, Court Reporter Gina M. Shrader is no longer obligated to prepare and file the requested transcripts.] NNP/CLK 05-13792
07/12/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.